Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Gros

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarentaise, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1801Born
23 Dec 182625.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 186665.5SelectedBishop of Tarentaise, France
22 Feb 186765.9ConfirmedBishop of Tarentaise, France
1 May 186766.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tarentaise, France
3 Mar 187372.0ResignedBishop of Tarentaise, France
8 Dec 188382.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarentaise, France

MicroData Summary for François Gros (VIAF: 27055548)
Bishop François Gros (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarentaise

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Offenge-Dessous
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chambéry, Archdiocese of Chambéry

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 535
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017