Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Giuseppe Cardinal Solaro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aosta

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1743BornSzeben
22 Feb 176623.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 178441.7AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
26 Sep 178441.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
15 May 180360.3ResignedBishop of Aosta, Italy
23 Sep 181673.7Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 181673.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
9 Sep 182481.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Giuseppe Solaro:
Cardinal Paolo Giuseppe Solaro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aosta

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
  • a cardinal for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Sep 1816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013