Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Contesini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1714BornVenice
22 Dec 173622.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 176854.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
31 Jan 176854.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
28 Feb 178571.1DiedTitular Archbishop of Athenae

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Contesini:
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Contesini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Athenae

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014