Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Polesini

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1729BornMontonae
22 Dec 175324.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 177242.5AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
5 Jul 177242.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
1 Jun 177848.5AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
9 Jan 181989.1DiedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Francesco Polesini:
Bishop Francesco Polesini (born , died ) Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013