Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ferdinando Maria Cardinal de Rossi

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1696BornCortona, Italy
30 Mar 173942.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 173943.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
2 Aug 173943.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
1 Feb 175154.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
24 Sep 175963.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
24 Sep 175963.1Elevated to Cardinal
28 Sep 175963.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
14 Dec 176771.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
4 Feb 177578.5DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Maria de Rossi:
Ferdinando Maria Cardinal de Rossi (born , died ) Prefect of Council

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
  • a cardinal for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jun 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014