Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Sorgo Bobali, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1721BornRagusa
21 Dec 174322.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
24 Jan 174524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Apr 177251.2SelectedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
7 Sep 177251.6ConfirmedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
13 Sep 177251.6Ordained BishopBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
29 Jun 180079.4DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Sorgo Bobali:
Bishop Francesco Maria Sorgo Bobali O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015