Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Jurileo

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1711BornTragurien
9 Dec 176554.7AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
15 Dec 176554.7Ordained BishopBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
29 Jul 177160.3AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
1788¹76.8DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Jurileo:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Jurileo (born ) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 95, and Page 314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015