Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Dobretić Jezerčić (Dobrebich), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman)

Titular Bishop of Erythrae


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Dec 1772AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman), Croatia
12 Dec 1772AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrae
6 Jun 1773Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrae
4 Apr 1784DiedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman), Croatia

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Mark Dobretić Jezerčić (Dobrebich):
Bishop Mark Dobretić Jezerčić (Dobrebich) O.F.M. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman)

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 210, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1773, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015