Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Split-Makarska

Archidioecesis Spalatensis-Macarscensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Zdenko Križić, O.C.D., Archbishop
  • Marin Barišić, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 27 July 1969
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Croatia
  • Square Kilometers: 4,008 (1,548 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://smn.hr/
  • Mailing Address: Nadbiskupski Ordinarijat, Poljana kneza Trpimira 7, 21000 Split, Hrvatska
  • Telephone: (021)407.501
  • Fax: 407.538

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Salona
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Salona (erected)
Archdiocese of Salona
5th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Salona Archdiocese of Salona
Archdiocese of Split (Spalato)
647Name ChangedArchdiocese of Salona Archdiocese of Split (Spalato)
Diocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)
30 June 1828UnitedDiocese of Makarska
Archdiocese of Split (Spalato)
Diocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)
1 August 1932Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska) (from Zadar to Immediately Subject)
Archdiocese of Split-Makarska
27 July 1969ElevatedDiocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska) Archdiocese of Split-Makarska

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)
1950260,000143932361,101107350149ap1951
Archdiocese of Split-Makarska
1970313,000365,00085.8%1501342841,102184517165ap1971
1980349,450432,86080.7%1721483201,092216514191ap1981
1990473,726495,35095.6%1881463341,418201526177ap1991
1999412,261472,08887.3%2001603601,145182534185ap2000
2000415,000475,00087.4%1991583571,162189535186ap2001
2001409,584473,88786.4%2031633661,119198531186ap2002
2002409,584473,88786.4%2041653691,109190517186ap2003
2003427,420473,88790.2%1991703691,158201505186ap2004
2004428,382464,32992.3%1991543531,213182497186ap2005
2010437,989468,80193.4%2011793801,152209460186ap2011
2014441,036456,02996.7%1891613501,260186481187ap2015
2017446,000475,00093.9%2041553591,242181374187ap2018
2020425,000445,00095.5%1971743711,145193463187ap2021
2022390,270419,64693.0%1961553511,111168435187ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Salona
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 419, to Page 421
  • Archdiocese of Split (Spalato)
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 459, and Page 460
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 240
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 302, and Page 303
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 320
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 361
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 385
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 350
  • Diocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 25, Page 75, to Page 77
  • Archdiocese of Split-Makarska
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 62, Page 197, and Page 198
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 17 Jun 2024