Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephanus Cosimi, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1629Born
5 Sep 167848.9AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
18 Sep 167848.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
10 May 170777.6DiedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Stephanus Cosimi
Archbishop Stephanus Cosimi C.R.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Split (Spalato)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast