Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Crescenzi, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Recanati e Loreto

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607¹BornRoma
13 Jul 164336.5AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
26 Jul 164336.5Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
13 Jun 164437.4AppointedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
15 Nov 164639.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
26 Aug 165245.6AppointedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
30 Dec 165851.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
14 May 166861.3ResignedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
19 Jan 167164.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
27 May 167568.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jul 167568.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
24 Feb 167669.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
9 Jan 168275.0ResignedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
8 May 168881.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Crescenzi (VIAF: 89109941)
Alessandro Cardinal Crescenzi C.R.S. (born 1607, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Recanati e Loreto

  • a bishop for 44.7 years
  • a cardinal for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 May 1675
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 334, and Page 116
  • ob/c2: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 16
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 263
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016