Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Megale

Deceased

Bishop of Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1615BornSanta Maria
27 Nov 167964.7AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
30 Nov 167964.7Ordained BishopBishop of Isola, Italy
4 Nov 168166.6DiedBishop of Isola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Megale:
Bishop Francesco Megale (born , died ) Bishop of Isola

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 228
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015