Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Davide Cocco Palmieri, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1632³BornPeschi
18 Feb 165724.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
24 Feb 165724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
15 May 168452.1AppointedBishop of Malta
4 Jun 168452.1Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
19 Sep 171179.4DiedBishop of Malta

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Davide Cocco Palmieri:
Bishop Davide Cocco Palmieri O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 264
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015