Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vittorio Priuli, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1645³Born
20 Dec 168843.0AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
2 Jan 168943.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
5 Nov 171266.9DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Priuli
Archbishop Vittorio Priuli C.R.L. (born , died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Pierre aux liens, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 1
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,070

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast