Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Mugiasca, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1635³BornCome
24 Mar 165924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Oct 168045.5AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
13 Oct 168045.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
11 Sep 169459.5DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alberto Mugiasca:
Bishop Alberto Mugiasca O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 77
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 17 Apr 2015