Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Bologna

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹BornNaples
12 Mar 167440.1AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
1680²46.0ResignedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
26 Nov 169157.9AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
2 Aug 169763.5DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bologna:
Archbishop Giuseppe Bologna (born 1634, died ) Archbishop of Capua

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 118, and Page 141
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015