Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Filocamo

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625¹BornReggio de Calabre
28 Mar 164823.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 167651.3AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
10 May 167651.3Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
14 Sep 168762.7DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Filocamo:
Bishop Paolo Filocamo (born 1625, died ) Bishop of Squillace

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 362
  • c2+: CB, 30 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015