Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Fabio Biondi (Blondus de Montealto)

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1588AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
17 Jan 1588Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
6 Dec 1618DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Fabio Biondi (Blondus de Montealto):
Patriarch Fabio Biondi (Blondus de Montealto) (died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014