Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Porfirio Feliciani

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Apr 1612AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
1 May 1612Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
2 Oct 1634DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Porfirio Feliciani:
Bishop Porfirio Feliciani (died ) Bishop of Foligno

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 191
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 52, Number 289
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015