Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ulpiano (Volpiano) Volpi

Deceased

Bishop of Novara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1559BornComo
11 Mar 160950.1AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
5 Apr 160950.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
16 Dec 161556.9ResignedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
13 Nov 161960.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Novara, Italy
10 Mar 162970.1DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ulpiano (Volpiano) Volpi:
Archbishop Ulpiano (Volpiano) Volpi (died ) Bishop of Novara

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 68, Number 397
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 332, and Page 262
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 46, Number 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015