Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Emilio Santoro

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560²Born
3 Jul 161757.5AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
16 Jul 161757.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
20 Nov 162363.8AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
30 Jul 163575.5DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Emilio Santoro
Archbishop Paolo Emilio Santoro (born 1560, died ) Archbishop of Urbino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaserta, Diocese of Caserta
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Cathedral, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceUrbino, Archdiocese of Urbino

  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 353, and Page 171
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 62, Number 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 17
  • ob/ln/loc: CB, 12 Oct 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Oct 2021

Quantcast