Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado

Archidioecesis Urbinatensis-Urbaniensis-Sancti Angeli in Vado



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giovanni Tani, Archbishop
  • Francesco Marinelli, Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Urbino
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Urbino (erected)
Archdiocese of Urbino
7 July 1563ElevatedDiocese of Urbino Archdiocese of Urbino
Archdiocese of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado
30 September 1986UnitedArchdiocese of Urbino
Diocese of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado
Archdiocese of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado
11 March 2000ElevatedArchdiocese of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado (no longer a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Urbino
195046,70047,00099.4%1088116402108297ap1951
197038,45038,50099.9%7410844571094111ap1971
198036,20038,20094.8%7113844301385111ap1981
Archdiocese of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado
199050,70051,00099.4%8611975221114551ap1991
199952,60054,00097.4%72981649912653ap2000
200053,10054,50097.4%7110816551012553ap2001
200153,50055,00097.3%65137868511313053ap2002
200254,62357,61794.8%65168167411714353ap2003
200354,60057,60094.8%63167969111614354ap2004
200454,60057,60094.8%6010707801014054ap2005
201050,50054,90092.0%5996874211010854ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014