Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Palma

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1643Born
16 Apr 168845.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 170966.4AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
23 Jun 170966.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
16 Mar 171875.1DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Palma
Bishop Carlo Palma (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrbino, Archdiocese of Urbino
Ordained BishopSant’Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceFossombrone, Diocese of Fossombrone

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 204
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 24
  • ob/c2+: AT, 28 Dec 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Number 20,518

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 10 Jan 2021

Quantcast