Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Vitelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹Born
25 Jul 163250.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
16 Aug 163250.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
21 Sep 163250.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
16 Nov 164361.8AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
1644²62.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
Feb 1646³64.0DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Vitelli (VIAF: 89444118)
Archbishop Francesco Vitelli (born 1582, died Feb 1646) Archbishop of Urbino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittà di Castello, Diocese of Città di Castello
Ordained BishopSan Salvatore, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceUrbino, Archdiocese of Urbino

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 353, and Page 335
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 30
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 292
  • ob/c2: AT, 20 Jan 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast