Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marco Antonio Cardinal Gozzadini

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574BornBologna
21 Jul 162147.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Aug 162147.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
25 Oct 162147.8AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
13 Mar 162248.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
23 May 162349.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
7 Jun 162349.4AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
1 Sep 162349.7DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Gozzadini:
Cardinal Marco Antonio Gozzadini (died ) Bishop of Faenza

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Jul 1621
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 337, and Page 16
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 75, Number 439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 23 Dec 2013