Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julius Benigni

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateEventTitle
10 May 1623AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
21 May 1623Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
8 Nov 1625AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
1 Jun 1628DiedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica

MicroData Summary for Julius Benigni
Archbishop Julius Benigni (died ) Secretary of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 335
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 80, Number 471
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018