Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Bosco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gerace

Secretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569¹BornBologna
20 Nov 161950.8AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
15 Dec 161950.9Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
8 Aug 162253.6AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
29 Jan 162455.0ResignedBishop of Gerace, Italy
27 Feb 162455.1AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
10 Jun 162960.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Gerace, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Bosco:
Bishop Alessandro Bosco (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gerace

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 202, and Page 129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015