Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristoforo Caetani

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornAnagni
10 May 162338.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Foligno, Italy
10 May 162338.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
21 May 162338.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
2 Oct 163449.7SucceededBishop of Foligno, Italy
12 Oct 164257.7DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Caetani (VIAF: 264564659)
Bishop Cristoforo Caetani (born 1585, died ) Bishop of Foligno

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 214, and Page 191
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 80, Number 472
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Sep 2016