Catholic-Hierarchy DC

St. Roberto Francesco Romolo Cardinal Bellarmino, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1542BornMontepulciano, Italy
21 Sep 156018.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
19 Mar 157027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Mar 159956.4Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 159956.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
18 Mar 160259.5AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
21 Apr 160259.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Capua, Italy
160562.2ResignedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
1 Jun 160562.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
31 Aug 162178.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
17 Sep 162179.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy
13 May 1923Beatified
29 Jun 1930Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Roberto Francesco Romolo Bellarmino:
Cardinal St. Roberto Francesco Romolo Bellarmino S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
  • a cardinal for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013