Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Masi

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornArezzo
18 May 161141.3AppointedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
23 May 161141.3Ordained BishopBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
18 Jul 162757.5AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
1636¹66.0DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Masi:
Bishop Giulio Masi , Bishop of Monopoli

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015