Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio d’Aquino

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹Born
24 Apr 159530.3AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
1 May 159530.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sarno, Italy
23 Jul 161853.5AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
27 Aug 162762.6DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio d’Aquino (VIAF: 251993647)
Archbishop Antonio d’Aquino (born 1565, died ) Archbishop of Taranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopS. Silvestre au Quirinal, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 306, and Page 327
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 34, Number 170
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast