Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léonardo Abel

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1541²BornMdina, Malta
20 Jul 158241.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
19 Aug 158241.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
2 May 160564.3DiedTitular Bishop of Sidon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Léonardo Abel (VIAF: 13160680)
Bishop Léonardo Abel (born 1541, died ) Titular Bishop of Sidon

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 299
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 315
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b: Treccani.it, 12 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016