Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Orozco Covarrubias y Leiva

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1544¹Born
12 May 157329.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 159450.9AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
8 Dec 159450.9Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
16 Jan 160662.0AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
23 Jun 161066.4DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Orozco Covarrubias y Leiva
Bishop Juan Orozco Covarrubias y Leiva (born 1544, died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopS.Jerome des Illyriens, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 73
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 34, Number 167
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 99
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 107, Number 675
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast