Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal Robuster y Senmanat

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orihuela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1524²Born
17 Aug 158763.6AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
25 Nov 158763.8Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
9 Nov 159369.8ResignedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
19 Oct 159773.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Orihuela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Robuster y Senmanat
Bishop Cristóbal Robuster y Senmanat (born 1524, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orihuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReus, Archdiocese of Tarragona
Ordained BishopS. Jacques des Espagnols, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 263
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 27, Number 127
  • bp/r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 99, Number 622
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018