Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Annibale D’Afflitto

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Nov 1593AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
30 Nov 1593Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
1 Apr 1638DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Annibale D’Afflitto:
Archbishop Annibale D’Afflitto (died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 284
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 33, Number 160
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013