Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Ottinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Fano


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Aug 1578AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
12 Feb 1586AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
28 Sep 1587AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
13 Nov 1592ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
25 Feb 1603DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Ottinelli
Bishop Giulio Ottinelli (died ) Bishop of Fano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 194, and Page 158
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016