Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Del Pezzo

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Nov 1593AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
30 Nov 1593Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
22 Apr 1621DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Del Pezzo
Bishop Cesare Del Pezzo (died ) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 358
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 326
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 33, Number 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,593, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast