Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Orihuela-Alicante

Dioecesis Oriolensis-Lucentinus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jesús Murgui Soriano, Bishop
  • Victorio Oliver Domingo, Bishop Emeritus
  • Rafael Palmero Ramos, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 9 March 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Valencia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Spain
  • Square Kilometers: 4,415 (1,705 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisoa.org/
  • Mailing Address: Plaza de la Montaneta 7, 03001 Alicante, Espana
  • Telephone: 95.520.49.09
  • Fax: 96.521.57.73

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Orihuela
14 July 1564ErectedDiocese of Cartagena (en España) Diocese of Orihuela (erected)
2 November 1949Territory LostDiocese of Cartagena (en España)
Diocese of Cuenca
Diocese of Orihuela
Diocese of Albacete (erected)
Diocese of Orihuela-Alicante
9 March 1959Name ChangedDiocese of Orihuela Diocese of Orihuela-Alicante

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Orihuela
1950444,000445,00099.8%170552251,97314058081ap1951
Diocese of Orihuela-Alicante
1969580,000590,00098.3%2891174061,4281591,126149ap1971
1980894,200902,84599.0%279963752,3841291,028196ap1981
19901,008,0001,074,22393.8%268983662,754139850201ap1991
19991,160,0001,173,84298.8%310863962,9291130593206ap2000
20001,140,0001,177,31596.8%326874132,760129685216ap2001
20011,140,0001,180,00096.6%320844042,821112708207ap2002
20021,152,0001,195,00096.4%318944122,796132720207ap2003
20031,152,0001,256,69791.7%313974102,809135726207ap2004
20041,155,0001,260,00091.7%318834012,880140721207ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 21 Jan 2014