Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Crespi y Borja, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1607³BornValencia
Sep 1631³24.3Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
8 May 165144.0SelectedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
28 Oct 165144.5ConfirmedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
1652²44.7Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
26 May 165851.1SelectedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
2 Sep 165851.3ConfirmedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
19 Apr 166356.0DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Crespi y Borja:
Bishop Luis Crespi y Borja C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,866
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 181, Number 1,130
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 282, and Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013