Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Elías Gómez Terán

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1688Born
5 May 173849.7AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
29 Jun 173849.9Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
9 Oct 175870.2DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Elías Gómez Terán
Bishop Juan Elías Gómez Terán (born , died ) Bishop of Orihuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 56, Number 249
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 319
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017