Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Antonio Díez Madroñero

Deceased

Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1714BornTalarrubias, Spain
24 May 175642.1AppointedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
3 Oct 175642.4Ordained BishopBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
3 Feb 176954.8DiedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Diego Antonio Díez Madroñero:
Bishop Diego Antonio Díez Madroñero (born , died ) Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 74, Number 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013