Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Martínez de Oneca

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1701³BornGallipienzo, Spain
24 May 175655.3AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
6 Nov 175756.8Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
27 Apr 176059.2DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Martínez de Oneca:
Bishop Pedro Martínez de Oneca (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 76, Number 373
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015