Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Milón López

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1680³BornPorto Longone
5 Apr 174565.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne
4 Jul 174565.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne
4 Jun 176282.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Milón López:
Archbishop Antonio Milón López (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 63, Number 295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013