Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Caballero y Góngora

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1723BornPriego, Córdoba, Spain
29 May 177552.0AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
17 Jul 177552.2SelectedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
11 Sep 177552.3ConfirmedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
30 Jun 177653.1Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
14 Dec 177855.6AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
23 May 177956.0InstalledArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
15 Sep 178865.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Córdoba, Spain
24 Mar 179672.8DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Caballero y Góngora:
Archbishop Antonio Caballero y Góngora (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 163, and Page 183
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 216, and Page 448
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 93, Number 476

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013