Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago José Echaverría Nieto de Osorio y Elguera

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1725BornSantiago
24 Jun 175024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cuba
16 May 176842.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Cuba
16 May 176842.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
2 Oct 176843.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
29 Jan 177044.5AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
10 Mar 178862.6AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
19 Jan 178963.5DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for Santiago José Echaverría Nieto de Osorio y Elguera:
Bishop Santiago José Echaverría Nieto de Osorio y Elguera (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013