Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antonio Pablo Sieni Flannings, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana

Titular Bishop of Tricale

Titular See: (Cyrille de Barcelona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1731³BornBarcelona, Spain
25 Jun 178453.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Cuba
25 Jun 178453.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricale
6 Mar 178553.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricale
10 Sep 178756.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
23 Nov 179362.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
18 Feb 180977.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio Pablo Sieni Flannings:
Bishop Francisco Antonio Pablo Sieni Flannings O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana

  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 102, Number 526
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 415, and Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 15 Jan 2016