Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana

Archidioecesis Avanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 6 January 1925
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cuba
  • Square Kilometers: 7,542 (2,913 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Calle Habana 152, La Habana 10100, Cuba
  • Telephone: (07)862.40.00/8/9
  • Fax: 866.81.09

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of San Cristobal de la Habana
10 September 1787ErectedDiocese of Santiago de Cuba Diocese of San Cristobal de la Habana (erected) (Provinces of Santa Clara, Matanzas, Havana, and Pinar del Rio in Cuba and Florida and Louisiana)
25 April 1793Territory LostDiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana Diocese of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans) (erected)
20 February 1903Territory LostDiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana Diocese of Pinar del Rio (erected)
20 February 1903Territory LostDiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana Diocese of Cienfuegos (erected)
10 December 1912Territory LostDiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana Diocese of Matanzas (erected)
Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana
6 January 1925ElevatedDiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana
19491,200,0001,235,93997.1%771932704,4444761,10862ap1951
19661,400,0001,600,00087.5%406310313,5929817866ap1967
19701,591,2002,150,30074.0%406210215,6008518866ap1971
19761,857,0002,705,00068.7%41549519,5479418866ap1977
19801,298,0002,743,30047.3%34508415,4528417466ap1981
19991,390,0002,777,24250.0%576211911,6801710923881ap2000
20001,798,0002,800,00064.2%536311615,5001710521281ap2001
20012,700,0002,800,00096.4%536311623,2751711722083ap2002
20022,709,0002,810,00096.4%535610924,8532110122083ap2003
20032,800,0003,800,00073.7%535410726,168219822883ap2004
20042,800,0003,900,00071.8%496211125,2252379348102ap2005
20102,821,0003,929,00071.8%4410114519,45524135265109ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 Jun 2013