Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Paula Barnada y Aguilar

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1835BornSantiago de Cuba
6 Apr 185823.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
11 Apr 185823.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
2 Jun 189964.1AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
2 Jul 189964.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
24 Jul 189964.3InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
8 Jun 191378.1DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula Barnada y Aguilar:
Archbishop Francisco de Paula Barnada y Aguilar (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 314
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013