Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedict Joseph Flaget, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1763Born
1 Jun 178824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
8 Apr 180844.4AppointedBishop of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
4 Nov 181046.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
25 Aug 183268.7ResignedBishop of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
17 Mar 183369.3AppointedBishop of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
11 Feb 185086.2DiedBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Benedict Joseph Flaget (VIAF: 4036934)
Bishop Benedict Joseph Flaget P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Louisville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceContournat, France
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Church, Fells Point

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1810, Number 11
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 105
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 453, Ascendance
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 96, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 25 Nov 2020

Quantcast