Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Philadelphia

Archidioecesis Philadelphiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Charles Joseph Chaput, O.F.M. Cap., Archbishop
  • Michael Joseph Fitzgerald, Auxiliary Bishop
  • John Joseph McIntyre, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Timothy Christian Senior, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Daniel Edward Thomas, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Justin Francis Rigali, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Louis Anthony DeSimone, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Martin Nicholas Lohmuller, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Robert Patrick Maginnis, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12 February 1875
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Pennsylvania
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 5,652 (2,183 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: III (NJ, PA)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: PH
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archdiocese-phl.org/
  • Mailing Address: 222 North 17th Street, Philadelphia, PA 19103-1299
  • Telephone: (215)587-4507
  • Fax: 587-4545

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Philadelphia
8 April 1808ErectedDiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Philadelphia (erected) (Pennsylvania, Delaware, and 7 counties of New Jersey)
11 August 1843Territory LostDiocese of Philadelphia Diocese of Pittsburgh (erected)
29 July 1853Territory LostArchdiocese of New York
Diocese of Philadelphia
Diocese of Newark (erected)
3 March 1868Territory LostDiocese of Philadelphia Diocese of Harrisburg (erected)
3 March 1868Territory LostDiocese of Philadelphia Diocese of Scranton (erected)
3 March 1868Territory LostArchdiocese of Baltimore
Diocese of Philadelphia
Diocese of Wilmington (erected)
Archdiocese of Philadelphia
12 February 1875ElevatedDiocese of Philadelphia Archdiocese of Philadelphia
28 January 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Philadelphia Diocese of Allentown (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Philadelphia
1910525,0002,712,70819.4%474108582902892,565ce
19501,058,0583,721,78628.4%1,2216721,8935588286,819398ap1951
19661,346,0953,813,00035.3%1,0756891,7647631,1496,324312ap1967
19701,352,6333,901,00034.7%1,0046661,6708091,0086,534316ap1971
19761,377,4693,901,00035.3%1,0026121,6148539486,053311ap1977
19801,379,1683,602,49538.3%9625531,51591018765,884307ap1981
19901,402,7533,961,02235.4%8904891,3791,017957134,638302ap1991
19991,411,2563,217,00043.9%7964191,2151,1611571413,873287ap2000
20001,418,5753,708,22638.3%7694041,1731,2091735483,764286ap2001
20011,430,1613,707,23838.6%7584071,1651,2271905503,711283ap2002
20021,488,3163,849,64738.7%7413921,1331,3131975303,547282ap2003
20031,494,8833,861,64838.7%7173661,0831,3802125113,428282ap2004
20041,486,0583,872,78338.4%7063721,0781,3782135033,366279ap2005
20101,464,9383,892,19437.6%6193699881,4822344812,763267ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 25 Nov 2013